EP4240095 - METHOD FOR HANDLING SESSION MANAGEMENT TIMER AFTER INTERSYSTEM CHANGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.08.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 01.03.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | 01.03.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEDIATEK INC. No. 1, Dusing 1st Rd. Hsinchu Science Park Hsinchu City 30078 / TW | [2023/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG-FU, Chien-Chun 30078 Hsinchu City / TW | 02 /
CHEN, Bo-Hun 30078 Hsinchu City / TW | 03 /
LI, Shang-Wu 30078 Hsinchu City / TW | [2023/36] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2023/36] | Application number, filing date | 23154741.5 | 02.02.2023 | [2023/36] | Priority number, date | US202263308179P | 09.02.2022 Original published format: US 202263308179 P | US202318103874 | 31.01.2023 Original published format: US202318103874 | [2023/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4240095 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/18, H04W36/08 | [2023/36] | CPC: |
H04W76/18 (EP);
H04W60/00 (EP,US);
H04W28/0289 (US);
H04W48/18 (US);
H04W76/19 (US);
H04W84/042 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/14] |
Former [2023/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HANDHABUNG EINES SITZUNGSVERWALTUNGSTIMERS NACH EINEM WECHSEL ZWISCHEN SYSTEMEN | [2023/36] | English: | METHOD FOR HANDLING SESSION MANAGEMENT TIMER AFTER INTERSYSTEM CHANGE | [2023/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION DE TEMPORISATEUR DE GESTION DE SESSION APRÈS UN CHANGEMENT INTERSYSTÈME | [2023/36] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/14] | 28.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP3883327 (SHARP KK [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0145] - paragraph [0147] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0156] * * paragraph [0170] * * paragraph [0359] * * paragraph [0475] * * paragraph [0476] - paragraph [0477] * * paragraph [0479] - paragraph [0481] * * paragraph [0484] - paragraph [0491] * * paragraph [0493] - paragraph [0498] * * paragraph [0499] - paragraph [0501] * * paragraph [0502] * * paragraph [0504] - paragraph [0509] * * paragraph [0510] - paragraph [0512] * * paragraph [0275] * * paragraph [0272] * * paragraph [0292] * * paragraph [0344] - paragraph [0345] * * paragraph [0347] - paragraph [0348] * * paragraph [0356] - paragraph [0358] * * paragraph [0360] - paragraph [0361] * * paragraph [0362] * * paragraph [0363] * [I] 8-11; | [XI] - MEDIATEK INC, "Handling of MM back-off timer", vol. SA WG2, no. Montreal, Canada; 20180226 - 20180302, (20180220), 3GPP DRAFT; S2-181461 DISC ON MM BACK-OFF TIMER, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fsa/WG2%5FArch/TSGS2%5F126%5FMontreal/Docs/, (20180220), XP051408198 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [I] 3-11 | [A] - MEDIATEK INC [TO BE SA2], "[DRAFT] Reply LS on Mobility management congestion control", vol. TSG SA, no. Montreal, Canada; 20180226 - 20180304, (20180220), 3GPP DRAFT; S2-181462 DRAFT REPLY TO LS C1-175413, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fsa/WG2%5FArch/TSGS2%5F126%5FMontreal/Docs/, (20180220), XP051408199 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | [A] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "Clarifications on NAS level mobility management congestion control", vol. CT WG1, no. West Palm Beach (FL), USA; 20181126 - 20181130, (20181209), 3GPP DRAFT; 24501_CR0591R2_(REL-15)_C1-18893, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings%5F3GPP%5FSYNC/CT/Docs/CP%2D183038%2Ezip, (20181209), XP051547060 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | [A] - MEDIATEK INC, "Correction to handling of NAS level mobility management congestion control", vol. CT WG1, no. Electronic meeting; 20200602 - 20200610, (20200619), 3GPP DRAFT; CP-201132, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ct/TSG_CT/TSGC_88e/Docs/CP-201132.zip, (20200619), XP052303424 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * |