EP4410904 - PTFE-REDUCED STRUCTURANTS FOR POWDER COATINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant International Ltd Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz / CH | [2024/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WUNDLECHNER, Milena 86368 Gersthofen / DE | 02 /
BODENDORFER, Simon 86368 Gersthofen / DE | 03 /
SCHWABE, Jeremia 86368 Gersthofen / DE | 04 /
REINER, Dorina 86368 Gersthofen / DE | 05 /
SPAR, Siegfried 86368 Gersthofen / DE | [2024/32] | Representative(s) | Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Patent Management Industriepark Höchst, G 860 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2024/32] | Application number, filing date | 23154832.2 | 03.02.2023 | [2024/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4410904 | Date: | 07.08.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/00 | [2024/32] | CPC: |
C09D5/00 (EP);
C09D5/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PTFE-REDUZIERTE STRUKTURIERUNGSMITTEL FÜR PULVERLACKE | [2024/32] | English: | PTFE-REDUCED STRUCTURANTS FOR POWDER COATINGS | [2024/32] | French: | AGENTS STRUCTURANTS RÉDUITS EN PTFE POUR REVÊTEMENTS EN POUDRE | [2024/32] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0982369 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS [JP]); | [XD]CN103160192 (ANHUI HUAHUI PLASTIC INDUSTRY SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [X]EP3192821 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP]); | [XD]CN112724799 (LIAONING ZHONGWANG ALUMINUM INTELLIGENT FURNITURE TECH CO LTD); | [X]EP3875269 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP], et al) | by applicant | EP2352772 | JP4818822B | CN103160192 | CN112724799 | US2022098490 |