EP4242152 - YARN THREADING APPARATUS, FALSE-TWIST TEXTURING MACHINE, AND YARN THREADING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.12.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.08.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TMT Machinery, Inc. 6th Fl., Osaka Green Bldg. 2-6-26, Kitahama Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [2023/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHIKADA, Hidekazu Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8686 / JP | 02 /
SASAGAWA, Takefumi Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8686 / JP | [2023/37] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/37] | Application number, filing date | 23155512.9 | 08.02.2023 | [2023/37] | Priority number, date | JP20220036243 | 09.03.2022 Original published format: JP 2022036243 | [2023/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4242152 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B65H54/34, B65H65/00 | [2023/37] | CPC: |
B65H54/343 (EP);
D02G1/0206 (CN);
B65H65/00 (EP);
D01H1/36 (CN);
D01H13/06 (CN);
B65H2701/31 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/04] |
Former [2023/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GARNEINFÄDELUNGSVORRICHTUNG, FALSCHDRALLTEXTURIERMASCHINE UND GARNEINFÄDELUNGSVERFAHREN | [2023/37] | English: | YARN THREADING APPARATUS, FALSE-TWIST TEXTURING MACHINE, AND YARN THREADING METHOD | [2023/37] | French: | APPAREIL D'ENFILAGE DE FIL, MACHINE DE TEXTURATION PAR FAUSSE TORSION ET PROCÉDÉ D'ENFILAGE DE FIL | [2023/37] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/04] | 19.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPH10194596 (MURATA MACHINERY LTD); | [A]US2002033429 (JASCHKE KLEMENS [DE], et al) | by applicant | JPH10194596 |