EP4227186 - VEHICLE ASSEMBLY COMPRISING A PROTECTION DEVICE AND VEHICLE COMPRISING SUCH AN ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALSTOM Holdings 48 rue Albert Dhalenne 93400 Saint-Ouen-sur-Seine / FR | [2023/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEUCAT, Cyril 17138 Puilboreau / FR | [2023/33] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2023/33] | Application number, filing date | 23155735.6 | 09.02.2023 | [2023/33] | Priority number, date | FR20220001207 | 11.02.2022 Original published format: FR 2201207 | [2023/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4227186 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B61D13/00, B61F19/06 | [2023/33] | CPC: |
B61F19/06 (EP);
B61D13/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] |
Former [2023/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGANORDNUNG MIT EINER SCHUTZVORRICHTUNG UND FAHRZEUG MIT SOLCH EINER ANORDNUNG | [2023/33] | English: | VEHICLE ASSEMBLY COMPRISING A PROTECTION DEVICE AND VEHICLE COMPRISING SUCH AN ASSEMBLY | [2023/33] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE VÉHICULE COMPRENANT UN DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION ET VÉHICULE COMPRENANT UN TEL ENSEMBLE | [2023/33] | Examination procedure | 06.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/41] | 06.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR365470 (JOHN POST [US]) [X] 1,10 * page 1, line 42 - page 2, line 64 * * figure - * * Voir notamment le filet flexible F *; | [XAI]FR413416 (ALBERT MUELLER [AT], et al) [X] 1,9,10 * the whole document * [A] 3-6 [I] 2,7,8; | [Y]DE883453 (HANSSEN KARL) [Y] 1,10* the whole document *; | [XAI]EP3458330 (SIEMENS MOBILITY GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,7,10 * paragraphs [0017] - [0020] * * figure - * [A] 3-6 [I] 2,8,9; | [Y]DE102020120183 (BOMBARDIER TRANSP GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,10 * the whole document * |