EP4219783 - EXTREMELY HIGH CONDUCTIVITY LOW COST STEEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innomaq 21, Sociedad Limitada c/ Jose Abascal, 44 4 28003 Madrid / ES | [2023/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VALLS ANGLÉS, Isaac 08228 Terrassa / ES | [2023/31] | Representative(s) | Elzaburu S.L.P. Edificio Torre de Cristal Paseo de la Castellana 259 C, planta 28 28046 Madrid / ES | [2023/31] | Application number, filing date | 23156386.7 | 18.03.2015 | [2023/31] | Priority number, date | EP20140382097 | 18.03.2014 Original published format: EP 14382097 | [2023/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4219783 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/08, C22C38/04, C22C38/32, C22C38/06, C21D1/20, C22C38/10, C22C38/12, C22C38/14, C21D6/00, C22C38/16, C22C38/02, C21D1/25, C22C38/00, // C22C38/54, C22C38/46, C22C38/44, C22C33/02, C22C38/28, C22C38/22 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
C21D1/20 (EP,US);
C22C38/58 (KR);
C21D1/25 (EP,US);
C21D6/004 (EP,US);
C21D6/005 (EP,US);
C21D6/007 (EP,US);
C21D6/008 (EP,US);
C22C38/002 (EP,US);
C22C38/005 (EP,US);
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,US);
C22C38/06 (EP,US);
C22C38/08 (EP,US);
C22C38/10 (EP,US);
C22C38/12 (EP,US);
C22C38/14 (EP,US);
C22C38/16 (EP,US);
C22C38/22 (EP,US);
C22C38/28 (EP,US);
C22C38/42 (KR);
C22C38/44 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/46 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/50 (KR);
C22C38/52 (KR);
C22C38/54 (EP,US);
B22F2998/10 (EP,US);
C21D2211/002 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/10, B22F9/08, B22F3/15, B22F3/04, B22F3/02, B22F3/14, B22F3/10, B22F3/115, B22F3/17, B22F3/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/11] |
Former [2023/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOSTENGÜNSTIGER STAHL MIT EXTREM HOHER LEITFÄHIGKEIT | [2023/31] | English: | EXTREMELY HIGH CONDUCTIVITY LOW COST STEEL | [2023/31] | French: | ACIER À FAIBLE COÛT À CONDUCTIVITÉ EXTRÊMEMENT ÉLEVÉE | [2023/31] | Examination procedure | 02.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/11] | 02.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15710217.9 / EP3119918 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS62149852 (HITACHI METALS LTD); | [X]JPH0243346 (HITACHI METALS LTD); | [A]EP0688883 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP], et al); | [A]JPH11131193 (NIPPON STEEL CORP, et al); | [A]JP2000345290 (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD); | [A]WO2008084108 (ROVALMA SA [ES], et al); | [XI]JP4432012B ; | [AD]EP2236639 (ROVALMA SA [ES], et al); | [A]EP2476772 (ROVALMA SA [ES]); | [AD]EP2662460 (VALLS BESITZ GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | EP1887096 | EP2236639 | WO2013167580 | WO2013167628 |