EP4227512 - HYDROGEN-OXYGEN FUELED POWERPLANT WITH WATER AND HEAT RECOVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 23.02.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | 23.02.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RTX Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2023/44] |
Former [2023/33] | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TERWILLIGER, Neil J. Cheshire, 06410 / US | 02 /
LEDWITH, Jr., Walter A. Marlborough, 06447 / US | 03 /
MA, David L. Avon, 06001 / US | 04 /
STAUBACH, Joseph B. Colchester, 06415 / US | [2023/33] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2023/33] | Application number, filing date | 23156392.5 | 13.02.2023 | [2023/33] | Priority number, date | US202217670080 | 11.02.2022 Original published format: US202217670080 | [2023/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4227512 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F02C3/22, F02C6/18, F02C1/00, F02C1/04 | [2023/33] | CPC: |
F02C6/18 (EP);
F02C6/04 (US);
F01K23/10 (EP);
F01K25/005 (EP);
F02C1/005 (EP);
F02C1/007 (EP);
F02C1/04 (EP);
F02C3/22 (EP);
F02C7/22 (US);
F02C9/40 (US);
F05D2220/62 (EP);
F05D2220/74 (EP);
F05D2260/207 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/13] |
Former [2023/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASSERSTOFF-SAUERSTOFF-KRAFTWERK MIT WASSER- UND WÄRMERÜCKGEWINNUNG | [2023/33] | English: | HYDROGEN-OXYGEN FUELED POWERPLANT WITH WATER AND HEAT RECOVERY | [2023/33] | French: | CENTRALE ÉNERGÉTIQUE À HYDROGÈNE-OXYGÈNE AVEC RÉCUPÉRATION D'EAU ET DE CHALEUR | [2023/33] | Examination procedure | 16.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/13] | 16.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2010314878 (DEWITT MONTE DOUGLAS [US]) [X] 15* paragraphs [0003] , [0023] , [0036]; figure 1 *; | [XAI]EP3048281 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [X] 1-4,6-8,11-15 * figures 1,2,3 * * paragraphs [0015] , [0020] , [0033] - [0038] - [0043] - [0053] - [0058] * [A] 5 [I] 9,10; | [A]CN211819659U (SONG XIAOXUAN) [A] 1-15 * See relevant passages of the automated translation concerning figure 1;; figure 1 *; | [X]US2021207500 (KLINGELS HERMANN [DE], et al) [X] 1,3-9,11,13-15 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0003] , [0036] - [0044] * |