EP4228336 - EMLSR TARGET WAKE TIME OPERATION IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 02.02.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | 02.02.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MediaTek Singapore Pte. Ltd. No. 1 Fusionopolis Walk No. 03-01 Solaris Singapore 138628 / SG | [2023/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEOK, Yongho San Jose, 95134 / US | 02 /
YEE, James Chih-Shi San Jose, 95134 / US | [2023/33] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2023/33] | Application number, filing date | 23156480.8 | 14.02.2023 | [2023/33] | Priority number, date | US202263310154P | 15.02.2022 Original published format: US 202263310154 P | US202318108854 | 13.02.2023 Original published format: US202318108854 | [2023/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4228336 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/02 | [2023/33] | CPC: |
H04W52/0216 (EP);
H04W52/0248 (US);
H04W52/0219 (EP);
H04W52/0229 (EP);
H04W52/0258 (US);
H04W52/028 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] |
Former [2023/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EMLSR-ZIELWECKZEITBETRIEB IN DER DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATION | [2023/33] | English: | EMLSR TARGET WAKE TIME OPERATION IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS | [2023/33] | French: | OPÉRATION DE TEMPS DE RÉVEIL CIBLE EMLSR DANS DES COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL | [2023/33] | Examination procedure | 30.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/10] | 30.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2021007168 (ASTERJADHI ALFRED [US], et al); |