EP4230476 - MULTI-LEVER LIFTING DEVICE FOR VEHICLE WITH IMPROVED EFFICIENCY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yun, Nam Ho 101-1208, 131, Samhyangcheon-ro Mokpo-si Jeollanam-do 58663 / KR | [2023/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2023/34] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Chaillot 16/20, avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74 92703 Colombes Cedex / FR | [2023/34] | Application number, filing date | 23156824.7 | 15.02.2023 | [2023/34] | Priority number, date | KR20220022588 | 21.02.2022 Original published format: KR 20220022588 | [2023/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4230476 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B60P1/44, B60R9/042 | [2023/34] | CPC: |
B60P1/4414 (EP);
B60P1/483 (KR);
B60R9/042 (EP,US);
B60P1/02 (KR);
B60P1/4471 (EP);
B60R9/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRHEBELHEBEVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG MIT VERBESSERTER EFFIZIENZ | [2023/34] | English: | MULTI-LEVER LIFTING DEVICE FOR VEHICLE WITH IMPROVED EFFICIENCY | [2023/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE LEVAGE À PLUSIEURS LEVIERS POUR VÉHICULE À EFFICACITÉ AMÉLIORÉE | [2023/34] | Examination procedure | 24.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/31] | 19.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2011148691 (TOYOTA AUTO BODY CO LTD [JP], et al); | [X]WO2020262953 (YUN NAM HO [KR]); | [IA]KR20210126930 (YUN NAM HO [KR]) | by applicant | KR20190075679 | KR102136663B |