Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
09.02.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
09.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant | |
09.02.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
09.02.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
28.07.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] |
17.02.2023 | Change - representative |