EP4234368 - VEHICLE-BODY FRONT STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 09.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant | 09.02.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | 09.02.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshida, Kota Aki-gun, Hiroshima, 730-8670 / JP | 02 /
Yotsuyanagi, Taiki Aki-gun, Hiroshima, 730-8670 / JP | 03 /
Kamei, Takehiro Aki-gun, Hiroshima, 730-8670 / JP | 04 /
Nakamura, Satoshi Aki-gun, Hiroshima, 730-8670 / JP | 05 /
Kimura, Takayuki Aki-gun, Hiroshima, 730-8670 / JP | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | Thoma, Michael Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2023/35] | Application number, filing date | 23157153.0 | 17.02.2023 | [2023/35] | Priority number, date | JP20220026685 | 24.02.2022 Original published format: JP 2022026685 | [2023/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4234368 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B62D21/11, B60K1/04, B62D25/08, B62D25/20 | [2023/35] | CPC: |
B62D25/2045 (EP);
B60K1/04 (EP,CN);
B60K1/00 (EP,CN);
B60L3/0007 (CN);
B60L50/66 (CN);
B62D21/11 (EP);
B62D25/082 (EP);
B62D25/20 (CN);
B60K17/354 (EP);
B60K17/356 (EP);
B60K2001/001 (EP);
B60K2001/0438 (EP,CN);
B60Y2306/01 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/11] |
Former [2023/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGKAROSSERIEFRONTSTRUKTUR | [2023/35] | English: | VEHICLE-BODY FRONT STRUCTURE | [2023/35] | French: | STRUCTURE AVANT DE CARROSSERIE DE VÉHICULE | [2023/35] | Examination procedure | 08.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/11] | 08.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2010264637 (KOSAKA NAOYA [JP], et al) [Y] 10* paragraph [0084]; figures 1-6 *; | [XYI]US9937781 (BRYER GILES D [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9,11,12,14 * figures 1,2 * * column 7, line 38 - column 8, line 51 * [Y] 10 [I] 8,13; | [XAI]CN109204480 (BYD CO LTD) [X] 1,2,6,7,9,11,14 * figures 9,10; claim 1 * * paragraphs [0085] , [0092] , [0102] , [0118] , [0125] * [A] 8 [I] 3-5,10; | [XAI]US2021171102 (HONG DEOK HWA [KR], et al) [X] 1,6,7,9,11,14 * figures 1, 2, 3, 6, 7, 8; claim 1 * * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0030] , [0036] , [0039] , [0041] * [A] 8,10,12 [I] 2-5,13 | by applicant | JP2009101952 |