EP4230835 - ELECTROMECHANICAL ACTUATOR AND CONCEALMENT DEVICE COMPRISING SUCH AN ELECTROMECHANICAL ACTUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2024 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Somfy Activites SA 50, avenue du Nouveau Monde 74300 Cluses / FR | [2023/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEPINE, Quentin 74300 CLUSES / FR | 02 /
ANNYCKE, Xavier 74300 CLUSES / FR | 03 /
ARES, Claude 74300 CLUSES / FR | [2023/34] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | [2023/34] | Application number, filing date | 23157208.2 | 17.02.2023 | [2023/34] | Priority number, date | FR20220001452 | 18.02.2022 Original published format: FR 2201452 | [2023/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4230835 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/72, H01R12/58, H01R13/115, H01R13/24, H01R13/6592, H01R13/6594, H01R13/6597, H05K9/00, E06B9/68 | [2023/34] | CPC: |
E06B9/72 (EP);
E06B9/68 (EP);
H01R12/53 (EP);
H01R13/6592 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/13] |
Former [2023/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROMECHANISCHER AKTUATOR UND VERDUNKELUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT SOLCH EINEM ELEKTROMECHANISCHEN AKTUATOR | [2023/34] | English: | ELECTROMECHANICAL ACTUATOR AND CONCEALMENT DEVICE COMPRISING SUCH AN ELECTROMECHANICAL ACTUATOR | [2023/34] | French: | ACTIONNEUR ÉLECTROMÉCANIQUE ET DISPOSITIF D'OCCULTATION COMPRENANT UN TEL ACTIONNEUR ÉLECTROMÉCANIQUE | [2024/30] |
Former [2023/34] | ACTIONNEUR ÉLECTROMÉCANIQUE ET DISPOSITIF D OCCULTATION COMPRENANT UN TEL ACTIONNEUR ÉLECTROMÉCANIQUE | Examination procedure | 16.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/13] | 16.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE102013004098 (SELVE VERMÖGENSVERWALTUNG GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [A]US9537264 (WANG NING [CN], et al) | by applicant | DE102013004098 |