EP4218816 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR USE IN PREVENTION AND/OR TREATMENT OF DISEASE THAT DEVELOPS OR PROGRESSES AS A RESULT OF DECREASE OR LOSS OF ACTIVITY OF BLOOD COAGULATION FACTOR VIII AND/OR ACTIVATED BLOOD COAGULATION FACTOR VIII [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 5-1, Ukima 5-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 115-8543 / JP | [2023/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YONEYAMA, Koichiro Tokyo, 103-8324 / JP | [2023/31] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2023/31] | Application number, filing date | 23157462.5 | 31.03.2015 | [2023/31] | Priority number, date | JP20140127240 | 20.06.2014 Original published format: JP 2014127240 | JP20140226988 | 07.11.2014 Original published format: JP 2014226988 | [2023/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4218816 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4218816 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61P7/04, C07K16/36, C07K16/46 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
A61P7/04 (EP,KR,RU);
A61K39/395 (IL,RU,US);
C07K16/36 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K16/46 (IL,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/545 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/16] |
Former [2023/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR VORBEUGUNG UND/ODER BEHANDLUNG VON KRANKHEITEN, DIE SICH ENTWICKELN ODER VERMEHREN AUFGRUND VON BLUTGERINNUNGSFAKTOR VIII UND/ODER AKTIVIERTEM BLUTGERINNUNGSFAKTOR VIII | [2023/31] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR USE IN PREVENTION AND/OR TREATMENT OF DISEASE THAT DEVELOPS OR PROGRESSES AS A RESULT OF DECREASE OR LOSS OF ACTIVITY OF BLOOD COAGULATION FACTOR VIII AND/OR ACTIVATED BLOOD COAGULATION FACTOR VIII | [2023/31] | French: | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE POUR LA PRÉVENTION ET/OU LE TRAITEMENT D'UNE MALADIE QUI SE DEVELOPPE OU SE PROGRESSION | [2023/31] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/16] | 11.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15809216.3 / EP3159006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2644698 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]); | by applicant | US3773919 | EP0058481 | EP0133988 | EP0239400 | WO9203918 | WO9312227 | WO9402602 | WO9425585 | WO9501937 | WO9602576 | WO9634096 | WO9633735 | WO9951743 | WO0220565 | WO0232925 | WO2004044011 | WO2005035754 | WO2005035756 | WO2005040229 | WO2006109592 | WO2011090088 | WO2012067176 |