EP4272885 - METHOD FOR FIXING A SOCKET BODY IN A TUBULAR BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 22.03.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | 22.03.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meleghy Automotive GmbH & Co. KG Dortmunder Straße 23 57234 Wilnsdorf / DE | [2023/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Werle, Thomas 51789 Lindlar-Frielingsdorf / DE | 02 /
Jahn, Joachim 47495 Rheinberg-Borth / DE | [2023/45] | Representative(s) | Kalkoff & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Martin-Schmeisser-Weg 3a-3b 44227 Dortmund / DE | [2023/45] | Application number, filing date | 23157488.0 | 20.02.2023 | [2023/45] | Priority number, date | DE202210110734 | 02.05.2022 Original published format: DE102022110734 | [2023/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4272885 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B21D39/04, B21D39/06, F16B7/00, B60G7/00 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
B21D39/044 (EP);
B21D39/06 (EP);
F16B17/004 (EP);
F16B7/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/17] |
Former [2023/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEFESTIGUNG EINES BUCHSENKÖRPERS IN EINEM ROHRKÖRPER | [2023/45] | English: | METHOD FOR FIXING A SOCKET BODY IN A TUBULAR BODY | [2023/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FIXATION D'UN CORPS FEMELLE DANS UN CORPS TUBULAIRE | [2023/45] | Examination procedure | 15.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/17] | 15.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]FR2277967 (WALLET JACQUES [FR]) [X] 9,10 * figure 4 *[A] 1-8; | [XAI]EP0558399 (GEC ALSTHOM T & D SA [FR]) [X] 1,4-6 * figure 3 * [A] 2,3,7,9,10 [I] 8; | [XI]EP1268097 (COSMA INT INC [CA]) [X] 1-5,7,9,10 * paragraphs [0019] , [0 20] * * figures 5, 6 * [I] 6,8; | [XI]US2006248704 (KUSCHEL STEPHAN [DE]) [X] 1-5,7,9,10 * paragraph [0020] * * figures 2, 5, 6 * [I] 6,8 |