EP4421622 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR IMPLEMENTING A SERVICE ON A RUNTIME ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2024/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Falk, Rainer 85586 Poing / DE | 02 /
Feist, Christian Peter 80689 München / DE | 03 /
Hornung, Peter 91054 Erlangen / DE | 04 /
Mantel, Martin 91325 Adelsdorf / DE | 05 /
Pyka, Stefan 85570 Markt Schwaben / DE | 06 /
Sperl, Franz 92526 Oberviechtach / DE | 07 /
Zeschg, Thomas 81543 München / DE | [2024/35] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [2024/35] | Application number, filing date | 23157748.7 | 21.02.2023 | [2024/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4421622 | Date: | 28.08.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F8/61, G06F21/53, // G06F9/445 | [2024/35] | CPC: |
G06F8/61 (EP);
G06F21/51 (EP);
G06F21/53 (EP);
G06F21/57 (EP);
G06F9/44505 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG EINES INSTALLATIONSVORGANGS FÜR EINE ANWENDUNG AUF EINER LAUFZEITUMGEBUNG WÄHREND DES BETRIEBS EINES SYSTEMS UNTER ÜBERPRÜFUNG VON WÄHREND DES INSTALLATIONSVORGANGS DURCHZUFÜHRENDEN MODIFIKATIONEN AUF DER SYSTEMLAUFZEITUMGEBUNG | [2024/35] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR IMPLEMENTING A SERVICE ON A RUNTIME ENVIRONMENT | [2024/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR EFFECTUER UNE OPÉRATION D'INSTALLATION POUR UNE APPLICATION SUR UN ENVIRONNEMENT D'EXÉCUTION PENDANT LE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN SYSTÈME TOUT EN VÉRIFIANT LES MODIFICATIONS DU TEMPS DE FONCTIONNEMENT DU SYSTÈME | [2024/35] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102018200390 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [I]US2020401389 (BOULTON ADAM JOHN [GB]) |