EP4276717 - INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS, ENERGY SYSTEM, AND BATTERY OPERATION PLAN CREATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 23.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2023/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRASIENAPIBAL, Thantip Sirinabhigupta 100-8280 Tokyo / JP | 02 /
OKAMOTO, Mamoru 100-8280 Tokyo / JP | 03 /
TAKEMOTO, Takashi 100-8280 Tokyo / JP | 04 /
UCHIGAITO, Hiroshi 100-8280 Tokyo / JP | [2023/46] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2023/46] | Application number, filing date | 23157853.5 | 21.02.2023 | [2023/46] | Priority number, date | JP20220078380 | 11.05.2022 Original published format: JP 2022078380 | [2023/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4276717 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/0631, G06Q50/02, // B64C39/02 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06315 (EP);
B60L53/51 (EP);
B60L53/52 (EP);
B60L53/63 (EP);
B60L53/66 (EP);
B60L53/80 (EP);
G06Q10/06313 (EP);
G06Q50/02 (EP);
B60L2200/10 (EP);
B60L2240/662 (EP);
B60L2240/665 (EP);
B60L2240/667 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, ENERGIESYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERSTELLUNG EINES BATTERIEBETRIEBSPLANS | [2023/46] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS, ENERGY SYSTEM, AND BATTERY OPERATION PLAN CREATION METHOD | [2023/46] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, SYSTÈME D'ÉNERGIE ET PROCÉDÉ DE CRÉATION DE PLAN DE FONCTIONNEMENT DE BATTERIE | [2023/46] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/46] | 23.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014303814 (BUREMA HARM [BR], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0093] ** paragraph [0130] - paragraphs [0165] , [0210] - [0211] *; | [IY]WO2015001930 (RESC LTD [JP]) [I] 1-11 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0030]; figures 1-4 * [Y] 4; | [Y]US2015039391 (HERSHKOVITZ BARAK [IL], et al) [Y] 4 * paragraphs [0140] , [0154] *; | [Y]CN109858794 (FENGJIANG WISDOM AGRICULTURE CO LTD) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0108] * * paragraph [0135] - paragraph [0176]; figure 6 *; | [IY]JP2021044972 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [I] 1-11 * paragraphs [0007] , [0016] - paragraphs [0020] , [0024] - [0027] - [0058] - [0074]; figure 1 * [Y] 4; | [IY] - UCHIGAITO HIROSHI ET AL, "Multi-objective Spatiotemporal Optimization of Transportation and Power Management by using Multiple Electric Vehicles in Nanogrid Networks", 2021 IEEE ELECTRICAL POWER AND ENERGY CONFERENCE (EPEC), IEEE, (20211022), doi:10.1109/EPEC52095.2021.9621698, pages 1 - 8, XP034035636 [I] 1-11 * page 365 - page 369 * * page 371 - page 372; figures 1-3 * [Y] 4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/EPEC52095.2021.9621698 | by applicant | JP2021528752 |