blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4239951

EP4239951 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SERVICE AUTHENTICATION IN AN AIRPORT MANAGEMENT NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.11.2023
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  04.08.2023
Most recent event   Tooltip25.02.2025New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tata Consultancy Services Limited
Nirmal Building 9th Floor Nariman Point Mumbai 400 021
Maharashtra / IN
[2023/36]
Inventor(s)01 / JAYAVARDHANA, Rama Gubbi LAKSHMINARASIMHA
560066 Bangalore, Karnataka / IN
02 / CHAUDHARI, RAJ ANIL
560066 Bangalore, Karnataka / IN
03 / SINGH DILIP THAKUR, MEENA
560066 Bangalore, Karnataka / IN
04 / PURUSHOTHAMAN, BALAMURALIDHAR
560066 Bangalore, Karnataka / IN
05 / ALASINGARA BHATTACHAR, RAJAN MINDIGAL
560009 Bangalore, Karnataka / IN
06 / SANTHANAM, SIVAKUMAR KUPPUSAMY
600086 Chennai, Tamil Nadu / IN
 [2023/36]
Representative(s)Goddar, Heinz J.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[2023/36]
Application number, filing date23157887.322.02.2023
[2023/36]
Priority number, dateIN20222101100101.03.2022         Original published format: IN202221011001
[2023/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4239951
Date:06.09.2023
Language:EN
[2023/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.07.2023
ClassificationIPC:H04L9/40
[2023/36]
CPC:
H04L63/0853 (EP); H04L63/108 (US); H04L63/101 (US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   ME,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2023/50]
Former [2023/36]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  ME,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR DIENSTAUTHENTIFIZIERUNG IN EINEM FLUGHAFENVERWALTUNGSNETZWERK[2023/36]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SERVICE AUTHENTICATION IN AN AIRPORT MANAGEMENT NETWORK[2023/36]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'AUTHENTIFICATION DE SERVICE DANS UN RÉSEAU DE GESTION D'AÉROPORT[2023/36]
Examination procedure06.11.2023Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.11.2023Examination requested  [2023/50]
06.11.2023Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.02.2025Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]WO0137169  (EYE TICKET CORP [US]) [A] 1-13 * page 1, line 19 - line 22 * * page 39, line 22 - page 41, line 14 * * page 53, line 2 * * page 54, line 9 - line 11 * * page 57, line 1 - page 58, line 12 * * page 59, line 2 - line 4 * * page 59, line 18 - line 22 * * page 60, line 7 - line 16 * * page 61, line 16 - line 18 * * page 63, line 8 - line 9 * * figure 6 *;
 [I]AU2015200814B  (AMADEUS SAS [FR]) [I] 1-13 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0045] * * figures 3, 4 *;
 [A]CN111401601  (UNIV NANJING AERONAUTICS & ASTRONAUTICS) [A] 1-13* claim 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.