EP4212523 - PYRAZOLE AMIDE COMPOUNDS AS IRAK INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 19.01.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | 19.01.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | 19.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rigel Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 1180 Veterans Boulevard South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2023/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSO, Kin San Francisco, 94131 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Yan Foster City, 944404 / US | 03 /
YEN, Rose San Francisco, 94110 / US | 04 /
TAYLOR, Vanessa San Francisco, 94121 / US | 05 /
HECKRODT, Thilo San Francisco, 94116 / US | 06 /
SINGH, Rajinder Belmont, 94002 / US | 07 /
SHAW, Simon Oakland, 94607 / US | 08 /
LI, Hui Oakland, 94607 / US | [2023/29] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2023/29] | Application number, filing date | 23158563.9 | 25.10.2017 | [2023/29] | Priority number, date | US201662413299P | 26.10.2016 Original published format: US 201662413299 P | [2023/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4212523 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/14, C07D405/14, C07D413/14, C07D471/04, A61K31/44, A61K31/4439, A61K31/497, A61P35/00, A61P37/00, A61P25/00, A61P9/00, A61P7/00, A61P1/00, A61P3/00, A61P11/00, A61P43/00, C07D401/12, C07D403/14, A61P37/02, A61P29/00, C07D403/12 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
C07D401/14 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/497 (CN);
A61K31/4439 (CN);
A61K31/444 (CN);
A61K31/4545 (CN);
A61K31/496 (CN);
A61K31/5377 (CN);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP,CN);
A61P13/12 (CN);
A61P15/00 (CN);
A61P25/00 (EP,CN);
A61P29/00 (EP,CN);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (CN);
A61P31/12 (CN);
A61P35/00 (EP,CN);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP,CN);
A61P37/08 (CN);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (CN);
A61P7/06 (CN);
A61P9/00 (EP,CN);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D403/12 (EP,US);
C07D403/14 (EP,US);
C07D405/14 (EP,CN,US);
C07D413/14 (EP,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/08] |
Former [2023/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PYRAZOLAMIDVERBINDUNGEN ALS IRAK-HEMMER | [2023/29] | English: | PYRAZOLE AMIDE COMPOUNDS AS IRAK INHIBITORS | [2023/29] | French: | COMPOSÉS PYRAZOLE AMIDE UTILISÉS EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS D'IRAK | [2023/29] | Examination procedure | 18.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/08] | 18.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17794624.1 / EP3532465 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011251176 (WANG XIAOJING [US]) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-24 ** page 33; compound 185 *; | [A]WO2015068856 (TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL [JP]) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-17 * * page 1, paragraph 1 *; | [AP]WO2016172560 (RIGEL PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [AP] 1-15 * claims 1-75 * * page 1, lines 9-11 * * examples * | by applicant | US4738851 | US4882150 | US4921475 | US5008110 | US5077033 | US5087240 | US5088977 | US5164189 | US5163899 | US5254346 | US5290561 | US5332213 | US5336168 | US5352456 | US5403841 | US5407713 | US5521222 | US5698219 | US5776445 | US5800807 | US6056950 | US6197934 | US6261547 | - S. M. BERGE et al., "Pharmaceutical Salts", J. Pharm. Sci., (19770000), vol. 66, doi:10.1002/jps.2600660104, pages 1 - 19, XP002675560 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600660104 | - "Pro-drugs as Novel Delivery Systems", T. HIGUCHIV. STELLA, A.C.S. Symposium Series, and in Bioreversible Carriers in Drug Design, American Pharmaceutical Association and Pergamon Press, (19870000), vol. 14 | - TUMAS et al., J. Allergy Clin. Immunol., (20010000), vol. 107, no. 6, pages 1025 - 1033 | - "General Principles", FINGLWOODBURY, Goodman and Gilman's The Pharmaceutical Basis of Therapeutics, Pergamon Press, vol. 1, pages 1 - 46 | - FOSTER, Allergy, (19950000), vol. 50, pages 6 - 9 | - SZELENYI et al., Arzneimittelforschung, (20000000), vol. 50, no. 11, pages 1037 - 42 | - KAWAGUCHI et al., Clin. Exp. Allergy, (19940000), vol. 24, no. 3, pages 238 - 244 | - SUGIMOTO et al., Immunopharmacology, (20000000), vol. 48, no. 1, pages 1 - 7 |