EP4235627 - LEARNING BASED SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR VISUAL DOCKING GUIDANCE TO DETECT NEW APPROACHING AIRCRAFT TYPES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 855 S. Mint Street Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAL, Debabrata Charlotte, 28202 / US | 02 /
ALLADI, Abhishek Charlotte, 28202 / US | 03 /
GADDE, Bhavya Sri Charlotte, 28202 / US | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [2023/35] | Application number, filing date | 23158650.4 | 24.02.2023 | [2023/35] | Priority number, date | IN202211009932 | 24.02.2022 Original published format: IN202211009932 | [2023/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4235627 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G08G5/06, G08G5/00 | [2023/35] | CPC: |
G08G5/0026 (EP);
G06V20/64 (US);
G06T7/10 (US);
G06T7/70 (US);
G06V10/764 (US);
G08G5/0082 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LERNBASIERTES SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VISUELLEN ANDOCKANLEITUNG ZUR ERKENNUNG NEUER SICH NÄHERNDER FLUGZEUGTYPEN | [2023/35] | English: | LEARNING BASED SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR VISUAL DOCKING GUIDANCE TO DETECT NEW APPROACHING AIRCRAFT TYPES | [2023/35] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ BASÉS SUR L'APPRENTISSAGE POUR GUIDAGE D'ACCUEIL VISUEL POUR DÉTECTER DE NOUVEAUX TYPES D'AÉRONEFS EN APPROCHE | [2023/35] | Examination procedure | 24.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/35] | 28.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP3196853 (SHENZHEN CIMC-TIANDA AIRPORT SUPPORT LTD [CN], et al) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [XY]EP3951421 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [X] 1,5,10-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0009] , [0018] , [0 27] - [0044] - [0 50] , [0 58] * [Y] 2-4; | [YA] - SYED ZAFAR ALI ET AL, "A generalized higher order neural network for aircraft recognition in a video docking system", NEURAL COMPUTING AND APPLICATIONS, SPRINGER-VERLAG, LO, (20090108), vol. 19, no. 1, ISSN 1433-3058, pages 21 - 32, XP019782458 [Y] 2-4 * the whole document * [A] 1,5-15 |