EP4210448 - MOUNTING SYSTEM AND DISPLAY CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuji Corporation 19, Chausuyama Yamamachi Chiryu-shi, Aichi 472-8686 / JP | [2023/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOZAWA, Mizuho Chiryu-shi, 472-8686 / JP | [2023/28] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/28] | Application number, filing date | 23158661.1 | 23.03.2017 | [2023/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4210448 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H05K13/08, H05K13/02 | [2023/28] | CPC: |
H05K13/081 (EP);
G05B19/4155 (US);
G06F3/1423 (US);
G08B5/22 (US);
H05K13/02 (EP);
H05K13/085 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/28] | Title | German: | MONTAGESYSTEM UND ANZEIGESTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2023/28] | English: | MOUNTING SYSTEM AND DISPLAY CONTROL DEVICE | [2023/28] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MONTAGE ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'AFFICHAGE | [2023/28] | Examination procedure | 27.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/28] | 09.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17901783.5 / EP3606310 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]WO2016151724 (FUJI MACHINE MFG [JP]) [X] 1-3,7 * abstract * [A] 6 [I] 4,5; | [E]EP3276442 (FUJI MACHINE MFG [JP]) [E] 1-5,7* paragraphs [0003] - [0010] - [0026] - [0027]; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | JP2007293588 | JP2014150137 |