blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4239177

EP4239177 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2024
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  04.08.2023
Most recent event   Tooltip19.02.2025New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PRATT & WHITNEY CANADA CORP.
1000 Marie Victorin, (01BE5)
Longueuil, Québec J4G 1A1 / CA
[2023/36]
Inventor(s)01 / BOLON, William
(01BE5) Longueuil, J4G 1A1 / CA
02 / POURNAZERI, Mohammad
(01BE5) Longueuil, J4G 1A1 / CA
03 / NAYEBPANAH, Nastaran
(01BE5) Longueuil, J4G 1A1 / CA
 [2023/36]
Representative(s)Dehns
10 Old Bailey
London EC4M 7NG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2023/36]Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date23158886.427.02.2023
[2023/36]
Priority number, dateUS20221768045525.02.2022         Original published format: US202217680455
[2023/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4239177
Date:06.09.2023
Language:EN
[2023/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.08.2023
ClassificationIPC:F02C7/277, F01D19/00, F16K31/06
[2023/36]
CPC:
F02C7/277 (EP); F01D19/00 (EP,US); F01D17/10 (EP);
F02C7/27 (US); F16K31/0675 (EP); F05D2200/11 (EP);
F05D2260/60 (US); F05D2260/85 (EP,US); F05D2270/304 (EP,US);
F05D2270/52 (EP,US); F05D2270/54 (EP); F05D2270/62 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   ME,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/15]
Former [2023/36]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  ME,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES VENTILS[2023/36]
English:METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A VALVE[2023/36]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UNE SOUPAPE[2023/36]
Examination procedure06.03.2024Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.03.2024Examination requested  [2024/15]
06.03.2024Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.02.2025Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US2010085676  (WILFERT RUSSELL [US]) [A] 1-15 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0030] *;
 [A]US2017233103  (TEICHOLZ MATTHEW D [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0053]; figure 2 *;
 [IA]US2021189983  (TREMBLAY JASON [CA]) [I] 1-6,8-15 * figures 2,3,5 * * paragraphs [0025] , [0027] , [0029] , [0033] , [0034] , [0035] , [0039] * [A] 7
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.