EP4236431 - CELL SITE AUXILIARY EQUIPMENT CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 08.03.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | 08.03.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIEMELÄ, Tuomas Helsinki / FI | 02 /
HÄMÄLÄINEN, Seppo Olavi Helsinki / FI | 03 /
SALMELA, Olli Pekka Helsinki / FI | 04 /
VOLKOV, Topi Tuomas Kantvik / FI | 05 /
KOSKELA, Henri Jonni Espoo / FI | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2023/35] | Application number, filing date | 23158935.9 | 28.02.2023 | [2023/35] | Priority number, date | FI20220005184 | 28.02.2022 Original published format: FI 20225184 | FI20220005880 | 30.09.2022 Original published format: FI 20225880 | [2023/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4236431 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/02, H04W88/12 | [2023/35] | CPC: |
H04W88/12 (EP);
H04W16/22 (US);
H04W24/02 (EP);
H04W24/10 (US);
H04W52/0209 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] |
Former [2023/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNG EINER HILFSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN ZELLENSTANDORT | [2023/35] | English: | CELL SITE AUXILIARY EQUIPMENT CONTROL | [2023/35] | French: | COMMANDE D'ÉQUIPEMENT AUXILIAIRE DE SITE CELLULAIRE | [2023/35] | Examination procedure | 30.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/15] | 29.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2009006010 (VAN SLOUN BRUCE P [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0051] *; | [YA]US2010228854 (MORRISON PATRICK S [US], et al) [Y] 8 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0106] * [A] 1-7,9-15; | [Y]WO2021101355 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0087] * * paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0109] *; | [A] - Anonymous, "ORAN WG2 AI-MLUse case CR traffic steering", ORAN ALLIANCES, (20191007), pages 1 - 8, URL: https://wiki.o-ran-sc.org/download/attachments/3604609/ATT-2019.10.07-ORAN-WG2_AIML_UseCase_CR_traffic_steering.docx?api=v2>, (20220328), XP055905638 [A] 1,3-7,9,10,12-15 * the whole document * |