EP4395404 - AUTOMATED WIRELESS RADIO CONFIGURATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Juniper Networks, Inc. 1133 Innovation Way Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2024/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, May Zar Sunnyvale, 94089 / US | 02 /
THOMAS, Jacob Sunnyvale, 94089 / US | 03 /
WANG, Wenfeng Sunnyvale, 94089 / US | [2024/27] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [2024/27] | Application number, filing date | 23159463.1 | 01.03.2023 | [2024/27] | Priority number, date | US202218148830 | 30.12.2022 Original published format: US202218148830 | [2024/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4395404 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/02, // H04W84/12 | [2024/27] | CPC: |
H04W24/02 (EP,US);
H04W84/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISIERTE DRAHTLOSE FUNKKONFIGURATION | [2024/27] | English: | AUTOMATED WIRELESS RADIO CONFIGURATION | [2024/27] | French: | CONFIGURATION RADIO SANS FIL AUTOMATISÉE | [2024/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US8983470 (RYAN DAVID JAMES [US], et al); | [IY]US2021058934 (JIANG QI [CN], et al); | [Y]US2021105579 (AKKARAKARAN SONY [US], et al) | by applicant | US9729439 | US9729682 | US9762485 | US9832082 | US9871748 | US9985883 | US10200264 | US10277506 | US10432522 | US10756983 | US10862742 | US10958585 | US10958537 | US10985969 | US10992543 | US11075824 | US2021306201 |