EP4209149 - GUIDE RAIL FOR A DRAWER PULL-OUT GUIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Julius Blum GmbH Industriestrasse 1 6973 Höchst / AT | [2023/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEUSBURGER, Marc 6863 Egg / AT | 02 /
SCHNEIDER, Martin 6971 Hard / AT | 03 /
BERCHTOLD, Pascal 6861 Alberschwende / AT | 04 /
SCHÖNFELDER, Helmut 6844 Altach / AT | [2023/28] | Representative(s) | Torggler & Hofmann Patentanwälte - Innsbruck Torggler & Hofmann Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Wilhelm-Greil-Straße 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [2023/28] | Application number, filing date | 23159640.4 | 07.12.2018 | [2023/28] | Priority number, date | AT20180050019 | 12.01.2018 Original published format: AT 500192018 | [2023/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4209149 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A47B88/487, A47B88/493, B21D11/08 | [2023/28] | CPC: |
A47B88/487 (EP);
A47B88/402 (AT);
A47B88/493 (EP,US);
B21D11/08 (EP,AT);
B21D53/38 (EP);
A47B2210/004 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/28] | Title | German: | FÜHRUNGSSCHIENE FÜR EINE SCHUBLADENAUSZIEHFÜHRUNG | [2023/28] | English: | GUIDE RAIL FOR A DRAWER PULL-OUT GUIDE | [2023/28] | French: | RAIL DE GUIDAGE POUR UN GUIDAGE DE SORTIE DE TIROIR | [2023/28] | Examination procedure | 13.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/24] | 02.02.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/24] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18826485.7 / EP3737263 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]GB2197810 (JACKSON PAUL ADRIAN SOUTHON, et al) [I] 1-6,8-12,14,15 * figures 1,2 * [Y] 7,13; | [Y]EP0363583 (BLUM GMBH JULIUS [AT]) [Y] 7,13 * figure 3 *; | [IY]DE102009056324 (DREISTERN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [I] 1-6,8-12,14,15 * figures 1,2 * [Y] 7,13; | [XI]AT518077B (BLUM GMBH JULIUS [AT]) [X] 1-6,8-15 * figures 4a, 4b * [I] 7; | [E]WO2019040954 (BLUM GMBH JULIUS [AT]) [E] 1-15* figures 1-5 * |