Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Event history: EP4425118


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
26.03.2025 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.03.2025 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
02.08.2024 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  04.09.2024  [2024/36]
03.03.2023 Change - representative