EP4238837 - WIPER DEVICE HAVING AT LEAST ONE END CAP UNIT AND METHOD FOR ASSEMBLING A WIPER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.08.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2023/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bubba, Marcello 3210 Linden / BE | 02 /
Kadas, Bence 1103 Budapest / HU | 03 /
Kuypers, Peter 3700 Tongeren / BE | 04 /
Bencsik, Barnabas 2473 Val / HU | [2023/36] | Application number, filing date | 23159810.3 | 03.03.2023 | [2023/36] | Priority number, date | DE202210202185 | 03.03.2022 Original published format: DE102022202185 | [2023/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4238837 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4238837 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/38 | [2023/36] | CPC: |
B60S1/3893 (EP);
B60S1/3889 (EP);
B60S1/3894 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/32] |
Former [2023/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WISCHERVORRICHTUNG MIT ZUMINDEST EINER ENDKAPPENEINHEIT UND VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE EINER WISCHERVORRICHTUNG | [2023/36] | English: | WIPER DEVICE HAVING AT LEAST ONE END CAP UNIT AND METHOD FOR ASSEMBLING A WIPER DEVICE | [2023/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ESSUIE-GLACE COMPRENANT AU MOINS UNE UNITÉ DE CAPUCHON D'EXTRÉMITÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE MONTAGE D'UN DISPOSITIF D'ESSUIE-GLACE | [2023/36] | Examination procedure | 27.06.2024 | Examination requested [2024/32] | 27.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.07.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 16.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2007144220 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [X] 4-9 * page 4, line 28 - page 5, line 2; figure - *; | [X]WO2012159802 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,11,12 * page 4, line 22 - page 6, line 7; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US2013326837 (DE BLOCK PETER [BE]) [X] 4-9* paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0026]; figures 6,8 *; | [X]WO2015000778 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,10-12 * page 19, line 6 - page 20, line 34; figures 13-15 *; | [A]DE102013221793 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-3,10-12 * paragraph [0031]; figure 3 * |