EP4239649 - CARE DELIVERY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.08.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hill-Rom Services, Inc. 1069 State Route 46 East Batesville, IN 47006-9167 / US | [2023/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEYERSON, Craig M. Batesville, 47006-9167 / US | 02 /
ETCHISON, Patrice Batesville, 47006-9167 / US | 03 /
KLEMBCZYK, Jeff Batesville, 47006-9167 / US | 04 /
RIBBLE, David Lance Batesville, 47006-9167 / US | 05 /
SHIRLEY, Daniel Batesville, 47006-9167 / US | 06 /
SUAREZ, Carlos Batesville, 47006-9167 / US | 07 /
WOLFE, Glen J. Batesville, 47006-9167 / US | [2023/36] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/36] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 23159859.0 | 03.03.2023 | [2023/36] | Priority number, date | US202263268864P | 04.03.2022 Original published format: US 202263268864 P | [2023/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4239649 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G16H50/30, G16H80/00, G16H15/00, G16H40/60 | [2023/36] | CPC: |
G16H80/00 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q10/103 (CN);
A61B5/746 (US);
G06Q10/0635 (CN);
G06Q50/22 (CN);
G16H40/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] |
Former [2023/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PFLEGEBEREITSTELLUNGSSYSTEM | [2023/36] | English: | CARE DELIVERY SYSTEM | [2023/36] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DISTRIBUTION DE SOINS | [2023/36] | Examination procedure | 06.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/15] | 06.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2007132597 (RODGERS MARK E [US]) [X] 1-4,6,7 * paragraphs [0027] , [0 76] - [0080] - [0 85] , [ 114] - [0116] - [ 121] - [0122] - [ 159]; figures 1, 2a, 8 * [Y] 5-7 [I] 8-11; | [A]US2018342329 (RUFO ANTHONY P [US], et al) [A] 1-15* claim all *; | [XYI]WO2019156665 (CAREPREDICT INC [US]) [X] 1-4,8 * paragraphs [0017] , [0 69] - [0070] - [0 77] , [0 84] , [0 86] , [0 95] - [0096]; figure 16 * [Y] 1,5-7 [I] 9,10; | [IY]EP3553786 (HILL ROM SERVICES INC [US]) [I] 10-15 * paragraphs [0081] - [0085] - [0 90] - [0092] - [ 104] , [ 114] , [ 117] , [ 121] , [ 129]; figure 1 * [Y] 1; | [Y] - Anonymous, "Floor sensor mats weight-sensing floor mat sensor pad alerts caregiver of resident activities", (20180723), pages 1 - 1, URL: https://www.facebook.com/balancemobility/videos/floor-sensor-matsweight-sensing-floor-mat-sensor-pad-alerts-caregiver-of-residen/2024521300925462/, (20230714), XP093064280 [Y] 5 * the whole document * |