EP4243079 - SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE, INTEGRATED CIRCUIT, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 10.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Digital Power Technologies Co., Ltd. Office 01, 39th Floor, Block A Antuoshan Headquarters Towers 33 Antuoshan 6th Road Futian District Shenzhen, 518043 / CN | [2023/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIAO, Chunkun Shenzhen, 518043 / CN | [2023/37] | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [2023/37] | Application number, filing date | 23160090.9 | 06.03.2023 | [2023/37] | Priority number, date | CN202210216617 | 07.03.2022 Original published format: CN202210216617 | [2023/37] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4243079 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/06, H01L29/10, H01L29/78 | [2023/37] | CPC: |
H01L29/7813 (EP);
H01L29/0607 (US);
H01L29/0692 (EP);
H01L29/1095 (EP);
H01L29/4236 (US);
H01L29/7827 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT, INTEGRIERTE SCHALTUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2023/37] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE, INTEGRATED CIRCUIT, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2023/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR, CIRCUIT INTÉGRÉ ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2023/37] | Examination procedure | 06.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/37] | 10.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US10700182 (AICHINGER THOMAS [AT], et al) [Y] 8* column 15, line 26 - column 16, line 5; figures 4A-4C *; | [XI]US2020303540 (MIYASHITA HIROYUKI [JP]) [X] 1,2,6,7,13,14,16 * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0071]; figures 1-5 * [I] 17,18; | [XI]US2020373292 (HOSHI YASUYUKI [JP]) [X] 1-3,6,7,13,14,16 * column 6, line 1 - column 7, line 23; figure 1 * * column 16, line 61 - column 17, line 42; figures 24, 25 * * column 10, line 14 - line 22 * [I] 4,5,17,18; | [XAYI]US10937901 (KINOSHITA AKIMASA [JP]) [X] 1,2,6,7,9-14,16 * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0066]; figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0090] * [A] 15 [Y] 8 [I] 17,18 |