EP4216608 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RRC STATE TRANSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.04.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FG INNOVATION COMPANY LIMITED Flat 2623, 26/F Tuen Mun Central Square 22 Hoi Wing Road, Tuen Mun New Territories Hong Kong / HK | [2023/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIH, Meiju Hsinchu 300 / TW | 02 /
TSENG, Yunglan Hsinchu 300 / TW | 03 /
CHEN, Hungchen Hsinchu 300 / TW | 04 /
CHOU, Chieming Hsinchu 300 / TW | [2023/30] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2023/30] | Application number, filing date | 23160438.0 | 09.08.2019 | [2023/30] | Priority number, date | US201862717747P | 10.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862717747 P | [2023/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4216608 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/27, H04W74/08, H04W36/14 | [2024/19] | CPC: |
H04W76/27 (EP,US);
H04W48/20 (US);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/30] | H04W36/00, H04W36/14, H04W74/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/47] |
Former [2023/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR RRC-ZUSTANDSÜBERGANG | [2023/30] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RRC STATE TRANSITION | [2023/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRANSITION D'ÉTAT RRC | [2023/30] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.10.2023 | Examination requested [2023/47] | 18.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19847730.9 / EP3834482 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2023 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   25.09.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA] - CATT, "Considerations on acceptable cell with Inactive Mode", vol. RAN WG2, no. Sanya, China; 20180416 - 20180420, (20180406), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1804276 CONSIDERATIONS ON ACCEPTABLE CELL WITH INACTIVE MODE, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG2%5FRL2/TSGR2%5F101bis/Docs/, (20180406), XP051415455 [I] 1,4-15 * page 1 * [A] 2,3 | [A] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "Inactive to Idle Transition Scenarios", vol. RAN WG2, no. Busan Korea; 20180521 - 20180525, (20180511), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1806887_INACTIVE_IDLE_FAILURE, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG2%5FRL2/TSGR2%5F102/Docs, (20180511), XP051464459 [A] 1-11 * page 1 - page 3 * | [A] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Priority Scenarios for RRC_INACTIVE", vol. RAN WG3, no. Athens, Greece; 20180226 - 20180302, (20180217), 3GPP DRAFT; R3-181360, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG3%5FIu/TSGR3%5F99/Docs/, (20180217), XP051401795 [A] 1-11 * page 3, paragraph 3 - page 4 * |