EP4219347 - STORAGE SYSTEM FOR STORING CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2024 | Deletion: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gebhardt Fördertechnik GmbH Neulandstrasse 28 D-74889 Sinsheim / DE | [2023/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eder, Rudolf 74869 Schwarzach / DE | 02 /
Gebhardt, Marco 74889 Sinsheim / DE | 03 /
Eder, Jörg 67661 Kaiserslautern / DE | [2023/31] | Representative(s) | Ullrich & Naumann PartG mbB Schneidmühlstrasse 21 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [2023/31] | Application number, filing date | 23160458.8 | 15.08.2019 | [2023/31] | Priority number, date | DE201810214214 | 22.08.2018 Original published format: DE102018214214 | [2023/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4219347 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4219347 | Date: | 07.08.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/04 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
B65G1/0464 (EP);
B65G1/0478 (EP);
B65G1/0485 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] |
Former [2023/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LAGERSYSTEM ZUM LAGERN VON BEHÄLTERN | [2023/31] | English: | STORAGE SYSTEM FOR STORING CONTAINERS | [2023/31] | French: | SYSTÈME DE STOCKAGE PERMETTANT DE STOCKER DES RÉCIPIENT | [2023/31] | Examination procedure | 06.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/41] | 06.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19191974.5 / EP3617096 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2014075937 (JAKOB HATTELAND LOGISTICS AS [NO]); | [A]WO2016198467 (OCADO INNOVATION LTD [GB]); | [A]WO2017121515 (AUTOSTORE TECH AS [NO]); | [AP]WO2019001816 (AUTOSTORE TECH AS [NO]); | [AP]WO2019141877 (OCADO INNOVATION LTD [GB]) | by applicant | WO2018069282 |