EP4213316 - ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR AND ELECTRICAL CONNECTION ARRANGEMENT COMPRISING AN ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 12.01.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 14.02.2024 [2024/07] | 12.01.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 14.02.2024 [2024/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TE Connectivity Germany GmbH Ampèrestraße 12-14 64625 Bensheim / DE | [2023/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ECKEL, Markus 68642 Bürstadt / DE | [2023/29] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/29] | Application number, filing date | 23160548.6 | 22.03.2018 | [2023/29] | Priority number, date | DE201710204939 | 23.03.2017 Original published format: DE102017204939 | [2023/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4213316 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01R24/66, H01R13/05, // H01R13/53 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
H01R13/055 (EP,US);
H01R13/533 (CN,KR,US);
H01R13/02 (CN);
H01R13/73 (CN);
H01R24/66 (EP);
H01R9/16 (US);
H05K7/2039 (CN,US);
H01R13/504 (US);
H01R13/53 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/07] |
Former [2023/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHER VERBINDER UND ELEKTRISCHE VERBINDUNGSANORDNUNG MIT EINEM ELEKTRISCHEN VERBINDER | [2023/29] | English: | ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR AND ELECTRICAL CONNECTION ARRANGEMENT COMPRISING AN ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR | [2023/29] | French: | CONNECTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE ET ENSEMBLE DE CONNEXION ÉLECTRIQUE COMPRENANT UN CONNECTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE | [2023/29] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/07] | 05.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18163421.3 / EP3379655 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2009122489 (TOMINAGA TSUTOMU [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7,9,10 * paragraphs [0034] , [0082] , [0083]; figures 1-8 * [I] 3,4,8; | [XI]DE102007055235 (CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,4,5,7,9-15 * paragraphs [0028] - [0031]; figures 1-2 * [I] 2,3,8; | [XI]US2011143580 (LEE MING-TSUNG [TW], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,9-12 * paragraphs [0019] - [0021]; figures 1-3B * [I] 3,8; | [X]DE102012216694 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,5,10,11 * abstract *; | [A]EP2993741 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0026]; figures 1-11 *; | [XI]DE102015016267 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-7,9-13 * paragraphs [0013] - [0030]; figures 1-4 * [I] 3,8 |