EP4246786 - A MOTOR ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.08.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 15.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant | 15.03.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | 15.03.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TVS Motor Company Limited Chaitanya, No.12 Khader Nawaz Khan Road Nungambakkam 600006 Chennai / IN | [2023/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saxena, Soumya 600 006 Chennai / IN | 02 /
Subramonian, Chidambaram 600 006 Chennai / IN | 03 /
Patil, Yogesh 600 006 Chennai / IN | [2023/38] | Representative(s) | Patentanwaltskanzlei Matschnig & Forsthuber OG Biberstraße 22 Postfach 36 1010 Wien / AT | [2023/38] | Application number, filing date | 23160639.3 | 08.03.2023 | [2023/38] | Priority number, date | IN202241014984 | 18.03.2022 Original published format: IN202241014984 | [2023/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4246786 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H02K21/22, H02K1/14, H02K1/16, H02K1/2791 | [2023/38] | CPC: |
H02K21/22 (EP);
H02K1/146 (EP);
H02K1/165 (EP);
H02K1/2791 (EP);
H02K2213/03 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/16] |
Former [2023/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOTORANORDNUNG | [2023/38] | English: | A MOTOR ASSEMBLY | [2023/38] | French: | ENSEMBLE MOTEUR | [2023/38] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/16] | 14.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2009003913 (SCHAEFFLER KG [DE], et al) [A] 1-13* figures 1,2 *; | [A]JP2014124092 (ASMO CO LTD) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0026]; figure 5 *; | [A]JP2017221100 (JOHNSON ELECTRIC SA) [A] 1-13 * figure 5 *; | [A]US2018323662 (JANG JEONG CHEOL [KR], et al) [A] 1-13 * figures 3,4 * |