EP4246742 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IONISING A GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.08.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 22.03.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | 22.03.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meech Static Eliminators Limited 2 Network Point, Range Road Witney Oxfordshire OX29 0YN / GB | [2023/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martinez, Jose Ricardo Witney, OX29 0YN / GB | 02 /
Holding, Daniel Witney, OX29 0YN / GB | [2023/38] | Representative(s) | Abel & Imray LLP Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | [2023/38] | Application number, filing date | 23161342.3 | 10.03.2023 | [2023/38] | Priority number, date | GB20220003530 | 14.03.2022 Original published format: GB 202203530 | [2023/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4246742 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01T23/00, H01T19/04, H05F3/06 | [2023/38] | CPC: |
H01T23/00 (EP);
H01T19/04 (EP);
H05F3/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/17] |
Former [2023/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR IONISIERUNG EINES GASES | [2023/38] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IONISING A GAS | [2023/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR L'IONISATION D'UN GAZ | [2023/38] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/17] | 20.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007274019 (NAKAJIMA YOMATSU [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0033] ** figure 3 *; | [XAI]JP2008159273 (KEYENCE CO LTD) [X] 1-4,14,15 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0024] * * figures 1, 6 * [A] 5-7,10-12 [I] 8,9,13; | [A]EP3950140 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0052] * * figure 3 * |