EP4257786 - LOCK FOR A WINDOW OR DOOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2024 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Iseo Serrature S.p.A. Via S. Girolamo 13 25055 Pisogne (Brescia) / IT | [2023/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOGNETTI, Marco 25030 Castel Mella (Brescia) / IT | [2023/41] | Representative(s) | Rapisardi, Mariacristina Ufficio Brevetti Rapisardi S.r.l. Via Serbelloni, 12 20122 Milano / IT | [2023/41] | Application number, filing date | 23163048.4 | 21.03.2023 | [2023/41] | Priority number, date | IT20220007058 | 08.04.2022 Original published format: IT202200007058 | [2023/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4257786 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4257786 | Date: | 24.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | E05B63/00, E05B65/10, E05C1/16, E05B59/00, // E05B15/04, E05B15/00 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
E05B63/0056 (EP);
E05B59/00 (EP);
E05B65/10 (EP);
E05C1/16 (EP);
E05B15/0053 (EP);
E05B2015/041 (EP);
E05B2015/0431 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/08] |
Former [2023/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHLOSS FÜR EIN FENSTER ODER EINE TÜR | [2023/41] | English: | LOCK FOR A WINDOW OR DOOR | [2023/41] | French: | SERRURE POUR UNE FENÊTRE OU UNE PORTE | [2023/41] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/08] | 17.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2323626 (NEWMAN TONKS GROUP PLC [GB]); | [A]EP2112304 (CESLOCKS GMBH [DE]); | [A]WO2011072334 (ASSA ABLOY AUSTRALIA PTY LTD [AU], et al); | [A]EP2468989 (DORMA GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [A]EP2503080 (GRUNDMANN BESCHLAGTECHNIK GMBH [AT]) | by applicant | GB2323626 | EP2112304 |