EP4220038 - CONTROL VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TGK CO., Ltd. 1211-4 Kunugida-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 193-0942 / JP | [2023/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIURA, Youichi Tokyo, 193-0942 / JP | 02 /
YUASA, Tomohiro Tokyo, 193-0942 / JP | [2023/31] | Representative(s) | Schröer, Gernot H. Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [2023/31] | Application number, filing date | 23163087.2 | 21.03.2022 | [2023/31] | Priority number, date | JP20210047608 | 22.03.2021 Original published format: JP 2021047608 | [2023/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4220038 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F25B41/325, F25B41/35, F16K1/38, F16K1/54 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
F25B41/325 (EP);
F16K1/42 (EP);
F16K25/005 (EP);
F16K31/04 (EP);
F16K31/408 (EP);
F16K31/50 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] |
Former [2023/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERVENTIL | [2023/31] | English: | CONTROL VALVE | [2023/31] | French: | SOUPAPE DE COMMANDE | [2023/31] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/10] | 26.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP22163335.7 / EP4063765 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2594393 (CARTER FRANKLYN Y) [X] 1 * column 4, line 20 - column 4, line 46; figure 1 *; | [Y]JPS63243581 (SAGINOMIYA SEISAKUSHO INC) [Y] 6* figure 1 *; | [XAY]JP2005069645 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [X] 1-5,7,8,10,11 * paragraph [0054]; figure 9 * [A] 9 [Y] 6; | [X]EP1530013 (FUJIKOKI CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0032]; figure 1 * | by applicant | JP2020041596 |