EP4254499 - DOUBLE IO PAD CELL INCLUDING ELECTROSTATIC DISCHARGE PROTECTION SCHEME WITH REDUCED LATCH-UP RISK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 12.04.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | 12.04.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2023/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stockinger, Michael A. 5656AG Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Moosa, Mohamed Suleman 5656AG Eindhoven / NL | [2023/40] | Representative(s) | Miles, John Richard NXP SEMICONDUCTORS Intellectual Property Group Abbey House 25 Clarendon Road Redhill, Surrey RH1 1QZ / GB | [2023/40] | Application number, filing date | 23163111.0 | 21.03.2023 | [2023/40] | Priority number, date | US202217702588 | 23.03.2022 Original published format: US202217702588 | [2023/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4254499 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/02 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
H01L27/0255 (EP,US);
H01L27/0292 (EP,US);
H01L27/0296 (EP,US);
H02H9/046 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/20] |
Former [2023/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DOPPEL-IO-PAD-ZELLE MIT SCHUTZSCHEMA GEGEN ELEKTROSTATISCHE ENTLADUNG MIT REDUZIERTEM LATCH-UP-RISIKO | [2023/40] | English: | DOUBLE IO PAD CELL INCLUDING ELECTROSTATIC DISCHARGE PROTECTION SCHEME WITH REDUCED LATCH-UP RISK | [2023/40] | French: | CELLULE À DOUBLE TAMPON IO COMPRENANT UN SCHÉMA DE PROTECTION CONTRE LES DÉCHARGES ÉLECTROSTATIQUES À RISQUE DE VERROUILLAGE RÉDUIT | [2023/40] | Examination procedure | 31.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2024 | Examination requested [2024/20] | 04.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002130390 (KER MING-DOU [TW], et al); | [I]US7579632 (SALIH ALI [US], et al); | [A]US9607976 (NAKAISO TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al); | [I]US11276688 (SHUKLA VRASHANK GURUDATTA [US], et al) |