EP4250523 - BATTERY ASSISTING APPARATUS AND RELATED DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.05.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.08.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Digital Power Technologies Co., Ltd. Office 01, 39th Floor, Block A Antuoshan Headquarters Towers 33 Antuoshan 6th Road Futian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518043 / CN | [2023/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAM, Kuet Liong 518043 Shenzhen / CN | [2023/39] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2023/39] | Application number, filing date | 23163392.6 | 22.03.2023 | [2023/39] | Priority number, date | CN202210288720 | 23.03.2022 Original published format: CN202210288720 | [2023/39] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4250523 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4250523 | Date: | 25.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00 | [2023/39] | CPC: |
H02J7/0014 (EP,CN);
G01R31/392 (US);
G01R31/396 (US);
H02J7/0019 (EP,US);
H02J7/005 (US);
H02J2207/20 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/01] |
Former [2023/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BATTERIEUNTERSTÜTZUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNG | [2023/39] | English: | BATTERY ASSISTING APPARATUS AND RELATED DEVICE | [2023/39] | French: | APPAREIL D'ASSISTANCE DE BATTERIE ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ | [2023/39] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/01] | 29.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013214739 (LEE JIA-YUAN [TW], et al); | [Y]US8766597 (NORK SAMUEL HODSON [US], et al); | [Y]US10003194 (FORNAGE MARTIN [US]); | [A]EP3553874 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) |