EP4221177 - METHOD, APPARATUS, AND SYSTEM FOR CHARACTERIZING AN OPTICAL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 26.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | 26.01.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | 26.01.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | 26.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Datamax-O'Neil Corporation 222 South Westmonte Drive, Suite 200 Altamonte Springs, FL 32714 / US | [2023/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ACKLEY, H. Sprague Morris Plains, 07950 / US | 02 /
QIAN, Si Morris Plains, 07950 / US | 03 /
CELINDER, Thomas Axel Jonas Morris Plains, 07950 / US | 04 /
D'ARMANCOUT, Sebastien Morris Plains, 07950 / US | [2023/31] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [2023/31] | Application number, filing date | 23163411.4 | 07.01.2019 | [2023/31] | Priority number, date | US201862614089P | 05.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862614089 P | US201916240295 | 04.01.2019 Original published format: US201916240295 | [2023/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4221177 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/04, G06K5/00, H04N1/00 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
G06K5/00 (EP,US);
G06K7/10673 (US);
G06K19/06009 (US);
G06K7/10851 (US);
G06K7/14 (US);
H04N1/00045 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/09] |
Former [2023/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR CHARAKTERISIERUNG EINES OPTISCHEN SYSTEMS | [2023/31] | English: | METHOD, APPARATUS, AND SYSTEM FOR CHARACTERIZING AN OPTICAL SYSTEM | [2023/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET SYSTÈME DE CARACTÉRISATION D'UN SYSTÈME OPTIQUE | [2023/31] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/09] | 25.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19150493.5 / EP3509285 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002181805 (LOEB HELEN S [US], et al); | [A]US2003102376 (MEIER TIMOTHY P [US], et al); | [A]JP2004341764 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) | by applicant | US6042279 |