EP4261424 - REMOVABLE PART AND BASE OF A SYSTEM FOR ATTACHING A SUPPORT FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE ACCESSORY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 05.04.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | 05.04.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault s.a.s 122-122 bis avenue du Général Leclerc 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [2023/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHLEUNIGER, Mathias 78280 GUYANCOURT / FR | [2023/42] | Application number, filing date | 23163565.7 | 22.03.2023 | [2023/42] | Priority number, date | FR20220003281 | 11.04.2022 Original published format: FR 2203281 | [2023/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4261424 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F16B21/02, B60R13/02, F16B5/12, F16B1/00 | [2023/42] | CPC: |
F16B21/02 (EP);
F16B5/126 (EP);
F16B2200/83 (EP);
F16B2200/93 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/19] |
Former [2023/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABNEHMBARES TEIL UND BASIS EINES BEFESTIGUNGSSYSTEMS FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUGZUBEHÖR | [2023/42] | English: | REMOVABLE PART AND BASE OF A SYSTEM FOR ATTACHING A SUPPORT FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE ACCESSORY | [2023/42] | French: | PARTIE AMOVIBLE ET BASE D'UN SYSTEME DE FIXATION D'UN SUPPORT POUR ACCESSOIRE DE VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2023/42] | Examination procedure | 03.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2024 | Examination requested [2024/19] | 03.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US2011030174 (FIEDLER JOACHIM [DE]) [I] 1-6,8-11 * paragraphs [0001] - [0066]; figures 1-17 * [Y] 7; | [A]US8585121 (MARX OLIVER [DE], et al) [A] 1* column 3, line 13 - column 6, line 18; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]CA3048519 (CIPO [CA], et al) [Y] 7 * paragraphs [0075] - [0076]; figures 18-21 * |