Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Event history: EP4435068


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
26.03.2025 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.02.2025 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
07.02.2025 Request for examination filed published on  12.03.2025  [2025/11]
04.02.2025 Amendment by applicant
22.08.2024 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  25.09.2024  [2024/39]
24.03.2023 Change - representative