EP4258697 - ENCODING AND DECODING METHOD AND ENCODING AND DECODING APPARATUS FOR STEREO SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHLOMOT, Eyal Long Beach, 90814 / US | 02 /
LI, Haiting Shenzhen, 518129 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Bin Shenzhen, 518129 / CN | [2023/41] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Engineering Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | [2023/41] | Application number, filing date | 23164063.2 | 25.07.2018 | [2023/41] | Priority number, date | CN201710614326 | 25.07.2017 Original published format: CN201710614326 | [2023/41] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4258697 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4258697 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/008, H04S3/00 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
G10L19/008 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G10L19/20 (US);
G10L19/24 (US);
H04S3/00 (EP,KR);
H04S3/008 (US);
H04S2420/03 (US)
|
Former IPC [2023/41] | H04S3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR CODIERUNG UND DECODIERUNG EINES STEREOSIGNALS | [2023/41] | English: | ENCODING AND DECODING METHOD AND ENCODING AND DECODING APPARATUS FOR STEREO SIGNAL | [2023/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CODAGE ET DE DÉCODAGE ET APPAREIL DE CODAGE ET DE DÉCODAGE POUR SIGNAL STÉRÉO | [2023/41] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/41] | 22.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18839134.6 / EP3648101 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - LINDBLOM J ET AL, "Flexible sum-difference stereo coding based on time-aligned signal components", APPLICATIONS OF SIGNAL PROCESSING TO AUDIO AND ACOUSTICS, 2005. IEEE W ORKSHOP ON NEW PALTZ, NY, USA OCTOBER 16-19, 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20051016), doi:10.1109/ASPAA.2005.1540218, ISBN 978-0-7803-9154-3, pages 255 - 258, XP010854377 [A] 1-19 * section 2; * * section 3; section 3.1; section 3.2; section 3.5 * * section 4; * * section 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ASPAA.2005.1540218 | [A] - C. TOURNEREY, C. FALLER, "Improved Time Delay Analysis/Synthesis for Parametric Stereo Audio Coding", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 120TH AES CONVENTION, Paris, France, (20060520), pages 1 - 9, XP040373082 [A] 1-18 * section 3.2 * * subsection "Image width" in section 5.4 * |