EP4233890 - PEPTIDES FOR TREATMENT AND PREVENTION OF DIABETES AND ASSOCIATED DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Université de Strasbourg 4, rue Blaise Pascal 67000 Strasbourg / FR | For all designated states Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale (INSERM) 101 rue de Tolbiac 75013 Paris / FR | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARION, Vincent 67640 LIPSHEIM / FR | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Becker et Associés 25, rue Louis le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | [2023/35] | Application number, filing date | 23164245.5 | 20.12.2019 | [2023/35] | Priority number, date | EP20180306794 | 21.12.2018 Original published format: EP 18306794 | [2023/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4233890 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4233890 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/48, A61P3/10 | [2023/35] | CPC: |
A61K38/4866 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K38/45 (CN,IL,US);
A61K45/06 (CN,IL,US);
A61P3/04 (CN);
A61P3/10 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C12N9/12 (CN);
| C-Set: |
A61K38/45, A61K2300/00 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/35] | Title | German: | PEPTIDE ZUR BEHANDLUNG UND PRÄVENTION VON DIABETES UND DAMIT VERBUNDENEN ERKRANKUNGEN | [2023/35] | English: | PEPTIDES FOR TREATMENT AND PREVENTION OF DIABETES AND ASSOCIATED DISORDERS | [2023/35] | French: | PEPTIDES POUR LE TRAITEMENT ET LA PRÉVENTION DU DIABÈTE ET DES TROUBLES ASSOCIÉS | [2023/35] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/38] | 10.05.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/38] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19835292.4 / EP3897697 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0018895 (CHILDRENS MEDICAL CENTER [US], et al); | [A]WO2007000770 (HADASIT MED RES SERVICE [IL], et al); | [AD]WO2015114062 (UNIV STRASBOURG [FR], et al) | by applicant | WO03043985 | WO2004103995 | WO2005117830 | WO2006075124 | WO2010011313 | WO2010033617 | WO2015114062 |