EP4254654 - MODULAR MAST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stations-E 3 Rue Marcel Pagnol 91800 Boussy-Saint-Antoine / FR | [2023/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIBIERE, François 91580 Etrechy / FR | 02 /
ROLLAND, Alain 91480 Quincy-Sous-Senart / FR | [2023/40] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [2023/40] | Application number, filing date | 23164797.5 | 28.03.2023 | [2023/40] | Priority number, date | FR20220002984 | 01.04.2022 Original published format: FR 2202984 | [2023/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4254654 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/12, E04H12/34, E04H12/08, // H01Q1/24 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
H01Q1/1228 (EP);
H01Q1/1242 (US);
E04H12/08 (EP);
E04H12/342 (EP);
H01Q21/0025 (US);
H01Q1/246 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] |
Former [2023/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODULARER MAST | [2023/40] | English: | MODULAR MAST | [2023/40] | French: | MÂT MODULAIRE | [2023/40] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/18] | 28.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2947292 (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]) [A] 1-11 * page 1, line 10 - page 2, line 20 * * page 4, line 5 - line 20 ** figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO2017055598 (LAGERWEY WIND B V [NL]) [A] 1-11 * figures 1b,3 * * page 1, line 4 - line 8 * * page 15, line 21 - line 31 *; | [A]US2019296419 (SMITH DANIEL [GB], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0050] , [0054] , [0055] , [0064] , [0065] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0081] * | by applicant | WO2010098653 | KR20210008291 |