Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4293389 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP23165014 US202217804240



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US12196843Global Dossier 14.01.2025B2
US2023393256 07.12.2023A1
Priority number Date
US202217804240 26.05.2022
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP4293389Global Dossier 27.03.2024A3
EP4293389 20.12.2023A2
Priority number Date
US202217804240 26.05.2022