Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP4223541 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP4223541



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 285
26.02.2024 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 3
26.02.2024 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
21.02.2024 Refund of fees Search / examination 2
21.02.2024 Refund of fees Search / examination 2
19.02.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.02.2024 General authorisation Search / examination 1
19.02.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.02.2024 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
14.02.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.02.2024 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
14.02.2024 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
14.02.2024 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
14.02.2024 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
14.02.2024 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
14.02.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
21.08.2023 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
14.07.2023 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
14.07.2023 European search opinion Search / examination 3
14.07.2023 European search report Search / examination 2
14.07.2023 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
12.07.2023 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
06.07.2023 Search started Search / examination 1
05.04.2023 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 13
05.04.2023 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 15
29.03.2023 Abstract Search / examination 1
29.03.2023 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
29.03.2023 Claims Search / examination 3
29.03.2023 Description Search / examination 40
29.03.2023 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
29.03.2023 Drawings Search / examination 15
29.03.2023 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
29.03.2023 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
31.08.2020 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 52
31.08.2020 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 71
04.06.2020 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 15
04.06.2020 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 13