Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4261138 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

AU2023201884 CN202310386572 EP23165313



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN116902209Global Dossier 20.10.2023A
Priority number Date
GB202205343 12.04.2022
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AU2023201884Global Dossier 26.10.2023A1
Priority number Date
GB202205343 12.04.2022
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP4261138Global Dossier 18.10.2023A1
Priority number Date
GB202205343 12.04.2022
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GB202205343D0 25.05.2022D0
Priority number Date
GB202205343 12.04.2022