EP4218610 - SURGICAL INTRODUCER WITH GUIDANCE SYSTEM RECEPTACLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.05.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2024 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vycor Medical, Inc. 951 Broken Sound Parkway Suite 320 Boca Raton, FL 33487 / US | [2024/41] |
Former [2023/31] | For all designated states Vycor Medical, Inc. 951 Broken Sound Parkway Suite 320 Boca Raton, FL 33487 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CANTOR, David Boca Raton, 33487 / US | 02 /
SCHAEFER, Robert Riverside, 19340 / US | [2023/31] | Representative(s) | Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | [2024/41] |
Former [2023/31] | SJW Patentanwälte Goethestraße 21 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 23165657.0 | 07.11.2017 | [2023/31] | Priority number, date | US201662418507P | 07.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662418507 P | US201615372890 | 08.12.2016 Original published format: US201615372890 | [2023/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4218610 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4218610 | Date: | 09.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/02, A61B17/34, A61B34/20 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
A61B90/39 (EP,US);
A61B34/20 (CN);
A61B17/0218 (US);
A61B17/02 (CN);
A61B17/3421 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/3439 (CN);
A61B90/361 (US);
A61B2017/0046 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00907 (EP,US);
A61B2017/347 (CN);
A61B2034/2051 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2055 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2068 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2090/3945 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3954 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/07] |
Former [2023/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | CHIRURGISCHE EINFÜHRVORRICHTUNG MIT FÜHRUNGSSYSTEMAUFNAHME | [2023/31] | English: | SURGICAL INTRODUCER WITH GUIDANCE SYSTEM RECEPTACLE | [2023/31] | French: | INTRODUCTEUR CHIRURGICAL AVEC RÉCEPTACLE DE SYSTÈME DE GUIDAGE | [2023/31] | Examination procedure | 10.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/07] | 10.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17868180.5 / EP3534802 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009048622 (WILSON JEFFREY A [US]); | [A]US2016015374 (GIFFORD AARON JAMES [US], et al) | by applicant | US2001027271 | US2008109026 | US2009048622 | US2010010315 | US2012071748 | US2013066154 | US2016015374 |