EP4272907 - METHOD FOR IMPROVING A PREPLANNED MOVEMENT SEQUENCE FOR CONTROLLING A ROBOT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SICK AG Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1 79183 Waldkirch / DE | [2023/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERLEWEIN, Patrick 79194 Heuweiler / DE | 02 /
HANSEN, Christoph 20535 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
FRANZ, Max 79254 Oberried / DE | [2023/45] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2023/45] | Application number, filing date | 23165789.1 | 31.03.2023 | [2023/45] | Priority number, date | DE202210110645 | 02.05.2022 Original published format: DE102022110645 | [2023/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4272907 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4272907 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/16 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
B25J9/1676 (EP,US);
B25J9/1666 (EP,US);
G05B2219/40202 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/50] |
Former [2023/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG EINES VORGEPLANTEN BEWEGUNGSABLAUFS FÜR DIE ANSTEUERUNG EINES ROBOTERS | [2023/45] | English: | METHOD FOR IMPROVING A PREPLANNED MOVEMENT SEQUENCE FOR CONTROLLING A ROBOT | [2023/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'AMÉLIORATION D'UN DÉROULEMENT DE MOUVEMENT PRÉPROGRAMMÉ POUR LA COMMANDE D'UN ROBOT | [2023/45] | Examination procedure | 08.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2023 | Examination requested [2023/50] | 08.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102013110905 (DAIMLER AG [DE], et al); | [A]DE102014007624 (DAIMLER AG [DE]); | [A]US2022105634 (OBORIL FABIAN [DE], et al) | by applicant | DE102013110901 | DE102013110905 | US2021309264 |