EP4248996 - ANTI-TREM2 ANTIBODIES AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.08.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alector LLC 131 Oyster Point Blvd, Suite 600 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2023/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHWABE, Tina South San Francisco, 94080 / US | 02 /
BROWN, Eric South San Francisco, 94080 / US | 03 /
KONG, Philip South San Francisco, 94080 / US | 04 /
TASSI, Ilaria South San Francisco, 94080 / US | 05 /
LEE, Seung-Joo South San Francisco, 94080 / US | 06 /
ROSENTHAL, Arnon South San Francisco, 94080 / US | 07 /
PEJCHAL, Robert South San Francisco, 94080 / US | 08 /
NIELSON, Nels P. South San Francisco, 94080 / US | [2023/39] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2023/39] | Application number, filing date | 23166216.4 | 02.08.2018 | [2023/39] | Priority number, date | US201762541019P | 03.08.2017 Original published format: US 201762541019 P | US201862636095P | 27.02.2018 Original published format: US 201862636095 P | [2023/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4248996 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4248996 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61K39/395 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
C07K16/2803 (EP,KR,US);
A61P25/28 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/51 (US);
C07K2317/52 (US);
C07K2317/56 (US);
C07K2317/71 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/75 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/39] | A61K39/395 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/24] |
Former [2023/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 08.05.2024 | ME | 08.05.2024 | Validation states | KH | 08.05.2024 | MA | 08.05.2024 | MD | 08.05.2024 | TN | 08.05.2024 | Title | German: | ANTI-TREM2 ANTIKÖRPER UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2023/39] | English: | ANTI-TREM2 ANTIBODIES AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2023/39] | French: | ANTICORPS DIRIGÉS CONTRE TREM2 ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2023/39] | Examination procedure | 08.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/24] | 08.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 02.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18759461.9 / EP3601358 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 02.08.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 02.08.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.08.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0127160 (APPLIED MOLECULAR EVOLUTION [US], et al); | [I]WO2016023019 (ALECTOR LLC [US]); | [I]WO2017062672 (ALECTOR LLC [US]); | by applicant | US4657760 | WO8704462 | US4816567 | EP0404097 | WO9110741 | US5206344 | WO9308829 | WO9311161 | US5225212 | WO9316185 | WO9404690 | US5545807 | US5545806 | WO9627011 | US5569825 | WO9634096 | WO9633735 | US5571894 | US5587458 | WO9711971 | US5625126 | US5633425 | US5641870 | US5648237 | US5661016 | US5731168 | US5739277 | WO9824893 | US5789199 | US5840523 | US5869046 | US5959177 | WO9958572 | US6040498 | US6075181 | US6150584 | US6417429 | US6420548 | WO2004042072 | US6982321 | US7087409 | US7125978 | US2007148167 | WO2007106585 | WO2008079246 | WO2009036379 | WO2010105256 | US2010280227 | WO2012009568 | WO2017062672 | WO2016US55828 |