EP4223319 - METHOD AND MOLECULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 12.07.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | 12.07.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MedImmune, LLC One MedImmune Way Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street 12th Floor Oakland CA 94607-5200 / US | [2023/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHRISTIE, Ronald James Gaithersburg, 20878 / US | 02 /
GAO, Changshou Gaithersburg, 20878 / US | 03 /
ST. AMANT, Andre Henri Oakland, 94607-5200 / US | 04 /
DE ALANIZ, Javier Read Oakland, 94607-5200 / US | [2023/32] | Representative(s) | AstraZeneca Intellectual Property Eastbrook House Shaftesbury Road Cambridge CB2 8BF / GB | [2023/32] | Application number, filing date | 23166601.7 | 25.05.2018 | [2023/32] | Priority number, date | US201762511415P | 26.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762511415 P | [2023/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4223319 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4223319 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/68, C07D249/12, C07K1/13, C07K1/107, C07C233/52, C07C247/10, C07C247/12, C07C271/22, C07D307/58, A61P35/00, A61K47/69, A61P29/00, C07C233/48 | [2023/32] | CPC: |
C07D307/58 (EP,EA,KR);
A61K47/6811 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61K47/6889 (EA,US);
A61K47/6923 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61P29/00 (EP,EA,KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,EA,KR);
C07C233/48 (EP,EA,KR);
C07C233/52 (EP,EA,KR);
C07C247/10 (EP,EA,KR);
C07C247/12 (EP,EA,KR);
C07C271/22 (EP,EA,KR,US);
C07D207/46 (EA,US);
C07K1/1077 (EP);
C07K1/13 (EP,EA,KR);
C07C2601/10 (EP,EA,KR,US);
C07C2602/50 (EP,EA,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/33] |
Former [2023/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND MOLEKÜLE | [2023/32] | English: | METHOD AND MOLECULES | [2023/32] | French: | PROCEDE ET MOLECULES | [2023/32] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2024 | Examination requested [2024/33] | 10.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18805779.8 / EP3630732 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1548109 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH AGENCY [JP]) [X] 1 * compounds 23,29 *; | [X]WO2013171485 (MEDICAL RES COUNCIL [GB]) [X] 1,2,14 * figure 1 *; | [XI] - KURT HOOGEWIJS ET AL, "Exploiting furan's versatile reactivity in reversible and irreversible orthogonal peptide labeling", CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, (20130101), vol. 49, no. 28, doi:10.1039/c3cc40588e, ISSN 1359-7345, page 2927, XP055179073 [X] 1,14 * figure 1 * [I] 2-11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c3cc40588e | [XA] - TILMAN PLASS ET AL, "Amino Acids for Diels-Alder Reactions in Living Cells", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE INTERNATIONAL EDITION, VERLAG CHEMIE, HOBOKEN, USA, (20120330), vol. 51, no. 17, doi:10.1002/ANIE.201108231, ISSN 1433-7851, pages 4166 - 4170, XP072080583 [X] 1,2,14 * scheme 1a * [A] 3-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.201108231 | [X] - MORITZ J SCHMIDT ET AL, "Red-Light-Controlled Protein-RNA Crosslinking with a Genetically Encoded Furan", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE INTERNATIONAL EDITION, VERLAG CHEMIE, HOBOKEN, USA, (20130319), vol. 52, no. 17, doi:10.1002/ANIE.201300754, ISSN 1433-7851, pages 4690 - 4693, XP072076681 [X] 1-11,14 * compound 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.201300754 | [XI] - DE ARAúJO ALINE DANTAS ET AL, "Diels-Alder Ligation and Surface Immobilization of Proteins", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE INTERNATIONAL EDITION, Hoboken, USA, (20060101), vol. 45, no. 2, doi:10.1002/anie.200502266, ISSN 1433-7851, pages 296 - 301, XP055777294 [X] 1-3,14 * compound 11 * [I] 4-11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.200502266 | [X] - BALDWIN J.E ET AL, "Use of L-aspartic acid [beta]-semialdehyde in the synthesis of more complex non protein amino acids", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, Amsterdam , NL, (19870101), vol. 28, no. 31, doi:10.1016/S0040-4039(00)95547-3, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 3605 - 3608, XP093061845 [X] 1 * compounds 9,11,12 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)95547-3 | [X] - EMINE KAYA ET AL, "A Genetically Encoded Norbornene Amino Acid for the Mild and Selective Modification of Proteins in a Copper-Free Click Reaction", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE INTERNATIONAL EDITION, VERLAG CHEMIE, HOBOKEN, USA, (20120321), vol. 51, no. 18, doi:10.1002/ANIE.201109252, ISSN 1433-7851, pages 4466 - 4469, XP072073535 [X] 1,2,14 * scheme 1a * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.201109252 | [X] - ALINE DANTAS DE ARAÚJO ET AL, "Diels-Alder Ligation of Peptides and Proteins", CHEMISTRY - A EUROPEAN JOURNAL, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC, DE, (20060628), vol. 12, no. 23, doi:10.1002/CHEM.200600148, ISSN 0947-6539, pages 6095 - 6109, XP071825428 [X] 1,2,14 * scheme 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/chem.200600148 | by applicant | US3896111 | US4137230 | US4151042 | US4248870 | US4256746 | US4260608 | US4265814 | US4294757 | US4307016 | US4308268 | US4308269 | US4309428 | US4313946 | US4315929 | US4317821 | US4322348 | US4331598 | US4361650 | US4362663 | US4364866 | US4371533 | US4424219 | US4450254 | EP0425235 | US5208020 | WO9321232 | US5416064 | WO9520401 | WO9627011 | US5635483 | US5663149 | US5712374 | US5714586 | US5739116 | WO9820734 | US5767285 | US5770701 | US5770710 | US5773001 | US5780588 | US5789208 | US5830912 | US5877296 | WO0012507 | US6335163 | WO0220565 | WO0248189 | WO02088172 | US2003082630 | US2003157561 | WO2004009618 | WO2005040170 | WO2005056764 | WO2005085251 | WO2005110423 | EP1641818 | WO2007024715 | WO2007039752 | US2008139791 | WO2009018386 | WO2009058379 | WO2009080251 | US7612062 | US7776814 | WO2011130324 | WO2012019123 | WO2013006544 | WO2013070565 | WO2013096291 | US2015005481 | WO2015019192 | - Protein Eng. Des. Sel., (20050000), vol. 18, pages 435 - 444 | - Protein Eng. Des. Sel., (20040000), vol. 17, pages 455 - 462 | - Nature Biotechnology, (20050000), vol. 23, no. 12, pages 1556 - 1561 | - Expert Opinion on Investigational Drugs, (20070600), vol. 16, no. 6, pages 909 - 917 | - J. Mol. Biol., (20030000), vol. 332, pages 489 - 503 | - Biol, (20070000), page 369 | - WOYKE et al., Antimicrob. Agents and Chemother, (20010000), vol. 45, pages 3580 - 3584 | - LIU et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19960000), vol. 93, pages 8618 - 8623 | - CHARI et al., Cancer Research, (19920000), vol. 52, pages 127 - 131 | - HINMAN et al., Cancer Research, (19930000), vol. 53, pages 3336 - 3342 | - LODE et al., Cancer Research, (19980000), vol. 58, pages 2925 - 2928 | - SASSE et al., J. Antibiot., (20000000), vol. 53, pages 879 - 885 | - STEINMETZ et al., Chem. Int. Ed., (20040000), vol. 43, pages 4888 - 4892 | - KHALIL et al., ChemBioChem, (20060000), vol. 7, pages 678 - 683 | - KAUR et al., Biochem. J., (20060000), vol. 396, pages 235 - 242 | - DOMLING et al., Mol. Diversity, (20050000), vol. 9, pages 141 - 147 | - LEDFORD, B. E.CARREIRA, E. M., "Total Synthesis of (+)-Trehazolin: Optically Active Spirocycloheptadienes as Useful Precursors for the Synthesis of Amino Cyclopentitols", Journal of the American Chemical Society, (19950000), vol. 117, doi:10.1021/ja00152a026, pages 11811 - 11812, XP001204125 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00152a026 | - PETERSON, G. I.CHURCH, D. C.YAKELIS, N. A.BOYDSTON, A. J., "1,2-oxazine linker as a thermal trigger for self-immolative polymers", Polymer, (20140000), vol. 55, doi:10.1016/j.polymer.2014.09.048, pages 5980 - 5985, XP029092601 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.polymer.2014.09.048 | - FOSTER, R. W.BENHAMOU, L.PORTER, M. J.BUCAR, D.-K.HAILES, H. C.TAME, C. J.SHEPPARD, T. D., "Irreversible endo-Selective Diels-Alder Reactions of Substituted Alkoxyfurans: A General Synthesis of endo-Cantharimides", Chemistry (Weinheim an Der Bergstrasse, Germany, (20150000), vol. 21, pages 6107 - 6114 | - HONZICEK, J.MUKHOPADHYAY, A.SANTOS-SILVA, T.ROMAO, M. J.ROMAO, C. C., "Ring-Functionalized Molybdenocene Complexes", Organometallics, (20090000), vol. 28, pages 2871 - 2879 |