EP4258015 - SUPPORT SYSTEM FOR MOBILE COORDINATE SCANNER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Faro Technologies, Inc. 125 Technology Park Lake Mary, FL 32746-6204 / US | [2023/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAHEED, Mufassar 70825 Korntal-Münchingen / DE | 02 /
WOLKE, Matthias 70825 Korntal-Müchingen / DE | 03 /
FRANK, Aleksej 70825 Korntal-Münchingen / DE | 04 /
BRENNER, Mark 70825 Korntal-Münchingen / DE | [2023/41] | Representative(s) | McNamara, Kathryn Novagraaf UK Centrum Norwich Research Park Colney Lane Norwich, Norfolk NR4 7UG / GB | [2023/41] | Application number, filing date | 23166834.4 | 05.04.2023 | [2023/41] | Priority number, date | US202263328910P | 08.04.2022 Original published format: US 202263328910 P | [2023/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4258015 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/481, G01C21/16, G01C21/00, G01S17/42, G01S17/86, G01S17/89, G01S17/931, G01S7/48, G01S7/51, F16M13/04 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
G01S17/86 (EP,US);
G01S17/89 (EP,US);
F16M11/08 (EP);
F16M11/2014 (EP);
F16M11/2092 (EP);
F16M11/24 (EP);
F16M13/04 (EP);
G01C15/002 (EP);
G01S17/42 (EP);
G01S17/931 (EP);
G01S7/4808 (EP);
G01S7/4815 (EP);
G01S7/4817 (US);
G01S7/51 (EP);
F16M2200/044 (EP);
F16M2200/063 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRÄGERSYSTEM FÜR MOBILEN KOORDINATENSCANNER | [2023/41] | English: | SUPPORT SYSTEM FOR MOBILE COORDINATE SCANNER | [2023/41] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SUPPORT POUR UN APPAREIL DE BALAYAGE DE COORDONNÉES MOBILE | [2023/41] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/37] | 03.05.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/37] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4158489 (GOTTSCHALK ROBERT E, et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 1 line 8-20, column 1 line 35-38;; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US2017123066 (CODDINGTON TIMOTHY [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0003] , [0005] , [0014] , [0015] , [0033] , [0041] , [0042] , [0043] , [0053] , [0054] , [0091] , [0097]; figures 2a, 3,4 *; | [A]US2018149469 (BECKER BERND-DIETMAR [DE], et al) [A] 15* paragraph [0081] *; | [A]WO2019018315 (KAARTA INC [US]) [A] 6 * paragraph [0184] *; | [A]WO2020079394 (Q BOT LTD [GB]) [A] 12 * figures 9,10 *; | [A]US2020217666 (ZHANG JI [US], et al) [A] 12 * figure 33 *; | [Y]DE102019120702 (NAVVIS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0015] , [0054] , [0060] , [0102] , [0105] , [0108] , [0136] , [0137]; figures 1A, 1B,2A, 2D, 3A,8; claim 34 *; | [A]US2021136350 (ZWEIGLE OLIVER [DE], et al) [A] 12 * figures 5,6 * | by applicant | US2012069352 |